MA H1914 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requirements of certain health care applicants and trainees. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve access to family physicians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-18HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1172 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H3429 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H250 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1282 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S681 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S843 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3388
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback