MA S2370 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2352
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Wareham to grant 4 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Wareham to grant 4 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-08 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-11-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-09-22 | Senate | New draft of S2352 |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2352 (Replaces) 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2370
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2370 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2370.pdf |