MA S2352 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2370
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Wareham to grant additional liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Wareham to grant additional liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2370 |
2014-08-18 | House | House concurred |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Replaced by) 2014-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2352 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2352.pdf |