MA S2351 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2861
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the safe integration of autonomous vehicles into the transportation system of the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
To promote the safe integration of autonomous vehicles into the transportation system of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2861 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1810 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2882 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2861 (Replaced by) 2022-05-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2337 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S113 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2847
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2882 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2861 (Replaced by) 2022-05-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2337 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S113 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2847
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2351.pdf |