MA S1349 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to marijuana-related revenue in the town of Millbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to marijuana-related revenue in the town of Millbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S1350 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2022
H3793 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S73 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S1350 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2022
H3793 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S73 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1349 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1349.pdf |