MA S1350 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sewer privilege fees in the town of Millbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to sewer privilege fees in the town of Millbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H3793 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S2952 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H3793 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S2952 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1350 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1350.pdf |