MA S2334 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain bridges in the town of Mashpee as the Private First Class Paul E. Conlon, Jr. Memorial Bridges. Transportation.
Title
Designating certain bridges in the town of Mashpee as the Private First Class Paul E. Conlon, Jr. Memorial Bridges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-09-09 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3836 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H69 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2019
H3065 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4191 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
H69 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2019
H3065 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4191 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2334.pdf |