MA H4191 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Mashpee be authorized to convey certain town owned conservation land to Mark and Donna Lopez. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Mashpee to convey certain town owned conservation land to Mark and Donna Lopez
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third |
2019-12-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1808 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1855 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) substituting a new draft see S2370
S1854 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2256
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H2770 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
S1855 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) substituting a new draft see S2370
S1854 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2256
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H2770 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4191 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4191.pdf |