MA S2334 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend voting protection to early voting. Election Laws.
Title
Extending voting protection to early voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2418 |
2018-03-09 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2331 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2418 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2418 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2334.pdf |