MA S2331 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the home rule charter of the city of Easthampton
Title
Amending the home rule charter of the city of Easthampton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-09-19 | House | Enacted |
2019-09-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-09-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2229 |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Humason) for S2229 |
Same As/Similar To
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
S2229 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S332 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
S2229 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S332 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2331.pdf |