MA S2328 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to standards for protective headgear for operators or passengers on motorcycles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to standards for protective headgear for operators or passengers on motorcycles
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2642 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2328.pdf |