MA S2308 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied H3429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied H3429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to unmanned aerial vehicles in the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Relative to unmanned aerial vehicles in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Accompanied H3429 |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1557 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3429 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3429 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2308.pdf |