MA S2303 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Westport to grant 1 additional liquor license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Westport to grant 1 additional liquor license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-05-14 | House | Enacted |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR 10) |
2018-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2018 from 12:30 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-02-15 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3963 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3941 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017
S2140 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2018
S2141 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2017
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
H176 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H145 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2507 (Similar To) 2018-09-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2018
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3941 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017
S2140 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2018
S2141 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2017
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
H176 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H145 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2507 (Similar To) 2018-09-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2018
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2303.pdf |