MA S2140 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the city of Salem to grant 1 additional liquor license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Salem to grant 1 additional liquor license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2018
2018-01-03SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-01-03HouseEnacted
2018-01-02HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-12-18HouseRules suspended
2017-12-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-14HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-12-11SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-11SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-11-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-09-08JointHearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-08-29JointHearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428
2017-08-23JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2017-08-07HouseHouse concurred
2017-08-03SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H176 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H145 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1977 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2793 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3753
H3941 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017
S2141 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2017
S2142 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2018
S2143 (Similar To) 2017-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 162 of the Acts of 2017
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback