MA H3941 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant 1 additional liquor license for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-12-14 | House | Enacted |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-11-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3753 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H197 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H196 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H176 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3950 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2018
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
H197 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H196 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H189 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H176 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3950 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2018
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3941.pdf |