MA H189 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local control of liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing municipal control of liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H197 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3950 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2018
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3950 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2018
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H189 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H189.pdf |