MA H3963 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3815). October 19, 2017.
Title
Designating a portion of Route 88 as Governor Argeo Paul Cellucci Circle in the town of Westport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-30 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-10-19 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-19 | House | Substituted for H3815 |
Same As/Similar To
H3815 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3963
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H807 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H809 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H807 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H809 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3963 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3963.pdf |