MA S2299 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1909
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the use of automatic license plate reader systems,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2299).
Title
To regulate the use of automatic license plate reader systems
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-02-12 | Senate | New draft of S1909 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1909 (Replaces) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2299
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2299.pdf |