MA S2265 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1821
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the enhanced protection of the dig safe law,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2265).
Title
Providing for the enhanced protection of the dig safe law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New draft of S1821 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1821 (Replaces) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2265
S1653 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S745 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S793 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S1653 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S745 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S793 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2265.pdf |