MA S1653 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public space recycling. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to public space recycling
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2310 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Read second |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 9th, 2016 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2310 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-06-24 | House | House concurred |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2310 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S399 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1553 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1073 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1081 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H814 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4621
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S399 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1553 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1073 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1081 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H814 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4621
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1653 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1653.pdf |