MA S2256 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, June 12, 2019 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to authorize the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain property in the town of Templeton (Senate, No. 1854),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2256).
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain property in the town of Templeton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Substituted for S1854 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1854 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1854 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2256
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
H4105 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4364
H4191 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
H4105 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4364
H4191 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4346
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2256 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2256.pdf |