MA S2246 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Accompanied H3902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Accompanied H3902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Board of Selectmen of the town of Duxbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Board of Selectmen of the town of Duxbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Accompanied H3902 |
2019-06-13 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3902 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2019
H3907 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2019
H4062 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2020
H4066 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2019
H4214 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2020
H3907 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2019
H4062 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2020
H4066 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2019
H4214 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2246 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2246.pdf |