MA H4214 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of West Boylston be authorized to rename the board of selectmen in said town to the select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the renaming of the board of selectmen to select board in the town of West Boylston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2020 |
2020-11-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-11-25 | House | Enacted |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-01-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2246 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Accompanied H3902
H3902 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2019
H3907 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2019
H4062 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2020
H4066 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2019
H3902 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2019
H3907 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2019
H4062 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2020
H4066 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4214.pdf |