MA S2127 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Department of Transportation to publish a schedule for construction on Route 3 from Boston to Plymouth. Transportation.
Title
Resolve relative to construction on Route 3
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3814 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3814 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2127 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2127.pdf |