MA S2126 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the observance of School Custodian Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the observance of School Custodian Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-11-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2469 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2608
H3101 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2022
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3102 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
S2124 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see S2789
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2069 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S515 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
H3101 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2022
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3102 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
S2124 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see S2789
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2069 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S515 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2126 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2126.pdf |