MA S515 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4596
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to build resilience to acidification of our coastal waters. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Building resilience to acidification of our coastal waters
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4596 |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2469 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2608
H3101 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2022
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3102 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
H3189 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2789 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4596 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2124 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see S2789
S2069 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3101 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2022
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3102 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
H3189 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2789 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4596 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2124 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see S2789
S2069 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S515.pdf |