MA S2123 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2890
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to penalties for operation of motor vehicles after unlawful removal of an ignition interlock device. Transportation.
Title
Relative to penalties for operation of motor vehicles after unlawful removal of an ignition interlock device
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2890 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2771 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1805 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S1116 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2314
H1426 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2314 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2890 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1805 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S1116 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2314
H1426 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2314 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2890 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2123.pdf |