MA S2084 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill establishing a sick leave bank for Jared Forgues, an employee of the Department of Correction (Senate, No. 2077),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2084).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jared Forgues, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-02-04 | House | Enacted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2077 |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2077 |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S15 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2015
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S39 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2015
S1917 (Similar To) 2015-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2015
S1925 (Similar To) 2015-05-14 - See H51
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S39 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2015
S1917 (Similar To) 2015-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2015
S1925 (Similar To) 2015-05-14 - See H51
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2084 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2084.pdf |