MA S2077 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow in specific situations, motorcyclists use of a breakdown or access lane, or splitting travel lanes . Transportation.
Title
Allowing in specific situations, motorcyclists use of a breakdown or access lane, or splitting travel lanes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2558 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2558 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3068 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2978 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S148 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3125 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3064 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4249 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2978 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S148 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3125 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3064 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4249 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2077 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2077.pdf |