MA H4249 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the identification of persons involved in automobile and motorcycle accidents by news media organizations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to automobile and motorcycle accidents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5037 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-12-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3055 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3259 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3060 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1417 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5037 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3055 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3259 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3060 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1417 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5037 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4249 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4249.pdf |