MA S2045 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1389
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for certain veterans. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Accompanied H1389 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1389 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1389 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2045.pdf |