MA S2030 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to accessible parking placards. Transportation.
Title
Relative to accessible parking placards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S762 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
H654 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H236 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S1814 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1278 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
H654 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H236 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S1814 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1278 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2030.pdf |