MA S1993 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect municipal authority relative to airports. Transportation.
Title
Protecting municipal authority relative to airports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2484 |
2017-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S884 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1935 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H3423 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1935 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H3423 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1993 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1993.pdf |