MA H3423 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating certain non-commercial aircraft at municipal airports. Transportation.
Title
Regulating non-commercial aircraft landing in municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2017-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3423 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3423.pdf |