MA S1990 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the civil fines and financial responsibilities and criminal penalties of motorists who violate the right of way of other motorists, motorcyclists, bicyclists and/or pedestrians, resulting in serious bodily injury and/or death. Transportation.
Title
Relative to increasing the civil fines and financial responsibilities and criminal penalties of motorists who violate the right of way of other motorists, motorcyclists, bicyclists and/or pedestrians, resulting in serious bodily injury and/or death
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1943 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S918 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1365 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S966 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1792 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1731 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
S2223 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2018
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S918 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1365 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S966 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1792 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1731 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2178 (Similar To) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
S2223 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2018
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1990.pdf |