MA S1943 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect motorists from excessive EZ-Pass fees and fines. Transportation.
Title
To protect motorists from excessive EZ-Pass fees and fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2484 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1990 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1943.pdf |