MA S2223 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to increasing City of Gloucester parking fines. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to increasing City of Gloucester parking fines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2018
2018-05-31SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-05-30HouseEnacted
2018-05-29HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-05-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended
2018-05-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-04-12HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-04-11SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-04-11SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-01-25SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-01-11SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-12-07HouseHouse concurred
2017-12-04SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1874 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback