MA S1989 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to vehicle recalls. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to vehicle recalls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-08-03 | House | House concurred |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S955 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1805 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
S209 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1805 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
S209 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1989 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1989.pdf |