MA S1977 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to veterans tax exemptions. Revenue.
Title
Relative to veterans tax exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5248 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2913 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S2395 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1934 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2423 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5248 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2913 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S2395 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1934 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2423 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5248 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1977.pdf |