MA S1953 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a tax credit for teachers purchasing supplies. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a tax credit for teachers purchasing supplies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2945 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1247 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2719
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2945 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1953 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1953.pdf |