MA S1940 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation for utility transition to using renewable energy (FUTURE). Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For utility transition to using renewable energy (FUTURE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseHouse concurred
2020-06-08SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday July 22, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-13SenateReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S528 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1945 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1946 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback