MA S2003 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2552

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to solar mobility systems. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to solar mobility systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2552
2019-06-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S528 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - House concurred
S1945 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback