MA H4248 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4435

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Old Rochester Regional School District to enter into renewable energy agreements. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing Old Rochester Regional School District to enter into renewable energy agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4435
2020-01-17JointHearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-12-11SenateSenate concurred
2019-12-09HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education
2019-11-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4435 (Replaced by) 2020-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback