MA H4435 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4248

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing Old Rochester Regional School District to enter into renewable energy agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing Old Rochester Regional School District to enter into renewable energy agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2020
2020-06-25SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-06-25HouseEnacted
2020-06-22SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-06-22HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-06-18SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2020-06-18SenateRules suspended
2020-06-17SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2020-03-16SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2020-03-12HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-03-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-03-09HouseRules suspended
2020-03-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-20HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-02-20HouseNew draft of H4248
2020-02-20HouseReported from the committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4248 (Replaces) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback