MA S1919 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to increased passenger safety. Transportation.
Title
Relative to increased passenger safety
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2484 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S855 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1063 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1063 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1919 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1919.pdf |