MA S1898 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote equality and respect in the legislature. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting equality and respect in the legislature

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S324 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1439 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1248 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H474 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H560 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2052 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1820 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback