MA S1896 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase accountability in the sale of personal data. Revenue.
Title
To increase accountability in the sale of personal data
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2820 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2908 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2910 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2908 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2910 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1896.pdf |