MA S186 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish Gateway City Opportunity Zones. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To establish Gateway City Opportunity Zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S219 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S263 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
S267 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S219 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S263 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
S267 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S186.pdf |