MA S1836 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2364
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide Gold Star license plates to families of fallen veterans not killed in combat. Transportation.
Title
Providing Gold Star license plates to families of fallen veterans not killed in combat
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2364 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2096 (Similar To) 2016-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2016
S1850 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S560 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1880 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H3087 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1899 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2096 (Similar To) 2016-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2016
S1850 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S560 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1880 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H3087 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1899 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1836 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1836.pdf |