MA S180 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transparency of economic development spending. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to transparency of economic development spending
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2486 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S181 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S1662 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1529 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1571 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H673 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3845
H2609 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2294 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2784 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2486 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4860 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
S181 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S1662 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1529 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1571 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H673 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3845
H2609 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2294 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2784 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2486 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4860 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S180 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S180.pdf |